Comes v. Torax Medical, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vicky Comes
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Torax Medical, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv04143
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Health Care/ Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service Executed by Vicky Comes. Ethicon, Inc. served on 10/29/2020, answer due 12/29/2020. (Janklow, A.) Modified docket text on 11/30/2020 (SAC).
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tracy Van Steenburg. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/25/2020. (MSB)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 12/29/2020. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/17/20. (SLW)
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Tracy J. Van Steenburgh to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3429227) by Ethicon, Inc., Torax Medical, Inc.. (Palmer, J.)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Ethicon, Inc., Torax Medical, Inc.. (Palmer, J.)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Crisman Palmer on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Torax Medical, Inc.. (Palmer, J.)
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Ethicon, Inc. on 10-27-20 (Janklow, A.)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vicky Comes. Torax Medical, Inc. served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Janklow, A.)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc., Torax Medical, Inc.. Summons, Rule 73 Memo and AO 85 delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Torax Summons, #2 Ethicon Summons, #3 AO85)(DJP)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3403509, in shell case on 10/2/2020 filed by Vicky Comes. (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Comes v. Torax Medical, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy Van Steenburgh
Represented By: J. Crisman Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torax Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy Van Steenburgh
Represented By: J. Crisman Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Comes
Represented By: A. Russell Janklow
Represented By: Shannon R. Falon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?