Reilly et al v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Brendan Reilly and Tiffany Reilly
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv04173
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Deani Beard Milano for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 12/2/20. (SLW)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 12/2/20. (SLW)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Deani Beard Milano to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3436676) by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Rylance, Richard)
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Extend Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company's Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Rylance, Richard)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Rylance, II on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Rylance, Richard)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Larry D. Deiter, Director Acknowledgement filed by Brendan Reilly, Tiffany Reilly. (Schulte, Eric)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. 1 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85)(SLW)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3424817, in shell case on 11/6/2020 filed by Brendan Reilly, Tiffany Reilly. (SLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reilly et al v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendan Reilly
Represented By: Eric C. Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Reilly
Represented By: Eric C. Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Deani Beard Milano
Represented By: Richard J. Rylance, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?