Stathis v. Marty Indian School Board Inc.
Plaintiff: Timothy Stathis
Defendant: Marty Indian School Board Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv04174
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Rebecca L. Kidder in Support of #6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Constitution and By-Laws, #2 Exhibit 2-SD Secretary of State Website Business Search, #3 Exhibit 3-Employment Contract, #4 Exhibit 4-Yankton Sioux Tribal Code Sections) (Kidder, Rebecca) Modified text on 1/5/2021 (DJP).
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 BRIEF by Defendant Marty Indian School Board Inc. in support of #6 Motion to Dismiss (Kidder, Rebecca) Modified text on 1/5/2021 (DJP).
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS by Marty Indian School Board Inc. (Kidder, Rebecca) Modified event to motion type on 1/5/2021 (DJP).
January 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca L. Kidder on behalf of Marty Indian School Board Inc.. (Kidder, Rebecca)
December 29, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Marty Indian School Board Inc. on December 16, 2020 (Taylor, James)
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Marty Indian School Board Inc. on December 15, 2020 (Taylor, James)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Marty Indian School Board Inc.. 1 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(KLE)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3425112, in shell case on 11/06/2020 filed by Timothy Stathis. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A: Contract, #2 Attachment B: Grant) (KLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stathis v. Marty Indian School Board Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Stathis
Represented By: James D. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Indian School Board Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca L. Kidder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?