Halling v. Auto Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Anita L. Halling
Defendant: Auto Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv04186
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/24/2021 Motions due by 10/22/2021. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/12/2021. (JLS)
January 12, 2021 Filing 6 Discovery Report re #5 Order for Discovery Report by Auto Owners Insurance Company. Related document: #5 Order for Discovery Report.(Williamson, Hilary)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/4/21. (JLS)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Auto Owners Insurance Company. (Williamson, Hilary)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Anita L. Halling. (Janklow, A.)
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Auto Owners Insurance Company. 1 Summons, a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Auto Owners Insurance Company, #2 AO85 Form)(JLS)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3438027, in shell case on 12/2/2020 filed by Anita L. Halling. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halling v. Auto Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita L. Halling
Represented By: A. Russell Janklow
Represented By: Kimberly J. Lanham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Hilary L. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?