Krough v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lisa Krough
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv04194
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Hanson, Laura)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Blake P. DeRosier. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 01/27/2021. (KLE)
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Blake P. DeRosier to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3468859) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Hanson, Laura)
January 27, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Attorney Laura J. Hanson added.. (Hanson, Laura)
December 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company . (Fuller, William)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 ADMISSION OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint Admission filed by Lisa Krough. (Schulte, Eric) Modified text on 12/18/2020 (DJP).
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. 1 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(KLE)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3441624, in shell case on 12/08/2020 filed by Lisa Krough. (KLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krough v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura J. Hanson
Represented By: Blake P. DeRosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Krough
Represented By: Eric C. Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?