Fischer-Olson v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Melissa Fischer-Olson
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv04198
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 02/01/2021. (LH)
January 27, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Mann, Rebecca)
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca L. Mann on behalf of Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Mann, Rebecca)
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Melissa Fischer-Olson served on Larry Dieter. (Brendtro, Daniel)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Transamerica Life Insurance Company. 1 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO85)(MSB)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3444675, in shell case on 12/11/2020 filed by Melissa Fischer-Olson. (MSB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fischer-Olson v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Fischer-Olson
Represented By: Daniel K. Brendtro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?