Jamison v. Cox
Petitioner: Roderick Jamison
Respondent: J.W. Cox
Case Number: 4:2020cv04201
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #8 MOTION to DISMISS, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2241). Objections to R&R due by 2/5/2021. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 1/22/2021. (CG) Modified on 1/22/2021 delivered to Petitioner via USPS (CLR).
January 21, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to DISMISS filed by Roderick Jamison. (SAC) (Main Document 11 replaced on 1/21/2021) (SAC). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2021: #1 Attachment, #2 Cover Letter & Envelope) (SAC). Modified on 1/21/2021 to split attachment 1 & 2 from main document (SAC).
January 11, 2021 Filing 10 DECLARATION of SHANNON BOLDT re #9 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #8 MOTION to DISMISS . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Public Information Inmate Data, #2 Exhibit B - Administrative Remedy Gen. Retrieval, #3 Exhibit C - Administrative Remedy Packet, #4 Exhibit D - Administrative Remedy Packet) (Ramsdell, Alison)
January 11, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to DISMISS filed by J.W. Cox. (Ramsdell, Alison)
January 11, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to DISMISS by J.W. Cox. (Ramsdell, Alison)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 Certified Mail receipt for U.S. Attorney General returned (SAC)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison J. Ramsdell on behalf of J.W. Cox. (Ramsdell, Alison)
December 31, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons served on 12/28/20. (SKK)
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE to #3 Order filed by Roderick Jamison. (SAC)
December 23, 2020 Filing Fee Received from Roderick Jamison. Fee Amount: $5.00, Receipt No.: #SDX500006489. (SAC)
December 17, 2020 TEXT CERTIFICATE OF CLERK - The Clerk has served an AO85 and a copy/copies of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2241), #3 Order on the Respondent and the following: - United States Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20530-0001, via certified mail, return receipt requested; - Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons,320 First St., NW, Washington, DC 20534, via certified mail, return receipt requested; - Diana Ryan, Assistant United States Attorney for the District of South Dakota, Civil Division, via Interoffice Mailbox in Sioux Falls. (CLR) Modified on 12/17/2020 delivered with AO 85 to Petitioner via USPS (CLR).
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing service upon respondents and ordering the parties to show cause by January 11, 2021. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 12/17/2020. (CG) Modified on 12/17/2020 delivered to Petitioner via USPS (CLR).
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PETITIONER: The Clerks Office has received your Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241. Although a new case has been opened, your case cannot proceed further until you either pay the filing fee OR complete and return the enclosed Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Declaration AND Prisoner Trust Account Report (to be completed by the institution where you are incarcerated.) Copy of docket sheet, motion to proceed IFP, and Prisoner Trust Account form sent to petitioner. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (SAC)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2241. (SAC) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/17/2020) (CLR). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2020: #2 Attachment) (CLR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jamison v. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roderick Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J.W. Cox
Represented By: Alison J. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?