Bogensberger v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Paul John Bogensberger
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv04064
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 05/28/2021. (KLE)
May 28, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Clausen, Timothy)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed 4/23/2021 Acknowledgement filed by Paul John Bogensberger. (Sims, William)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to USAA Casualty Insurance Company. See Doc. 2 for Rule 73 Memo and AO 85. (DJP)
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Paul John Bogensberger. (Sims, William)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 73 MEMO. (Attachments: #1 AO 85)(SLT)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3522506, in shell case on 4/14/2021 filed by Paul John Bogensberger on 4/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 12-8-20 Ltr, #2 Exhibit 2 - 12-14-20 Ltr, #3 Exhibit 3 - 1-12-21 Ltr, #4 xhibit 4 - 1-12-21 Ltr, #5 Exhibit 5 - 1-13-21 Ltr, #6 Exhibit 6 - 1-15-21 Ltr, #7 Exhibit 7 - 2-11-21 Ltr, #8 Exhibit 8 - 2-16-21 Ltr, #9 Exhibit 9 - 2-16-21 Ltr, #10 Exhibit 10 - 3-21-21 Ltr, #11 Exhibit 11 - 3-30-21 Ltr) (SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bogensberger v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul John Bogensberger
Represented By: William D. Sims
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy A. Clausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?