Fredricks v. Saul
Plaintiff: Tania M. Fredricks
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2021cv04087
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney as to Andrew Saul. Attorney Meghan K. Roche added.. (Roche, Meghan)
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 (FILED IN ERROR) Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney as to Andrew Saul. Attorney Meghan K. Roche added. Attorney Alison J. Ramsdell terminated. (Roche, Meghan) Modified Docket Text on 6/30/2021 (DLC).
June 29, 2021 NOTICE of Filing Error: #7 Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Roche, Meghan)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison J. Ramsdell on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Ramsdell, Alison)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons, AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO85)(DJP)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 5/11/2021. (DJP)
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tania M. Fredricks. (DJP)
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT on Social Security Appeal filed by Tania M. Fredricks on 5/11/2021. (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fredricks v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Meghan K. Roche
Represented By: Alison J. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel - Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tania M. Fredricks
Represented By: Steven R. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?