Tranmer v. Yankton FPC, Warden
Petitioner: Adam S Tranmer
Respondent: Yankton FPC, Warden
Case Number: 4:2021cv04089
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Filing Fee Received from Adam S Tranmer. Fee Amount: $5.00, Receipt No.: #SDX300003824. (DLC)
June 3, 2021 Filing 12 DECLARATION of SASHA LABRENZ re #10 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim , #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Public Information Inmate Data, #2 Exhibit B - Inmate History - First Step, #3 Exhibit C - Inmate History - Case Mgt., #4 Exhibit D - Inmate History - Drug Pgms., #5 Exhibit E - Inmate History - Educ. Info., #6 Exhibit F - Inmate History - PT Other, #7 Exhibit G - Education Transcript) (Ramsdell, Alison)
June 3, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Yankton FPC, Warden. (Ramsdell, Alison)
June 3, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies, MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by Yankton FPC, Warden. (Ramsdell, Alison)
June 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison J. Ramsdell on behalf of Yankton FPC, Warden. (Ramsdell, Alison)
May 24, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT as to Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons served on 5/17/2021. (CLR)
May 21, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT as to United States Attorney General served on 5/18/2021. (CLR)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing service upon respondent;denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 5/13/2021. (CG)
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PETITIONER: The Clerks Office has received your Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 together with a Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Declaration and Prisoner Trust Account Report. A new case has been opened. Copy of docket sheet sent to petitoner. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (CLR)
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Adam S Tranmer. (CLR)
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (CLR)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adam S Tranmer. (CLR)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2241. (Attachments: #1 Administrative Documents) (CLR)
May 13, 2021 TEXT CERTIFICATE OF CLERK - The Clerk has served an AO85 and a copy/copies of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2241), #6 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on the Respondent and the following: - United States Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20530-0001, via certified mail, return receipt requested; - Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons,320 First St., NW, Washington, DC 20534, via certified mail, return receipt requested; - Diana Ryan, Assistant United States Attorney for the District of South Dakota, Civil Division, via electronic delivery. (SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tranmer v. Yankton FPC, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Yankton FPC, Warden
Represented By: Alison J. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adam S Tranmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?