Fazel v. Yankton FPC Warden
Petitioner: Donald O. Fazel
Respondent: Yankton FPC Warden and K. Bennett
Case Number: 4:2021cv04143
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENT by Petitioner Donald O. Fazel re #3 MOTION Emergency Order For Immediate RRC Submission Under the Second Chance Act Law Due to BOP Failure. (Attachments: #1 Medical Record) (MSB)
September 15, 2021 Filing 15 OBJECTION by Petitioner Donald O. Fazel re #11 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim , #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion and #13 Declaration of JILL STERNHAGEN (MSB)
September 9, 2021 Filing 14 Amended PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2241. (Attachments: #1 BOP Documents) (MSB)
September 7, 2021 Filing 13 DECLARATION of JILL STERNHAGEN re #11 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim , #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Public Information Inmate Data, #2 Exhibit B - Program Review) (Ramsdell, Alison)
September 7, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Yankton FPC Warden. (Ramsdell, Alison)
September 7, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by Yankton FPC Warden. (Ramsdell, Alison)
September 1, 2021 Filing Fee Received from Donald O. Fazel. Fee Amount: $5.00, Receipt No.: #SDX300003887. (DLC)
August 26, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE served upon US Attorney General. (MSB)
August 26, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE served upon Director of Federal Bureau of Prisons. (MSB)
August 25, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney as to Yankton FPC Warden. Attorney Alison J. Ramsdell added. Attorney Civil United States Attorney terminated. (Ramsdell, Alison)
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (MSB)
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of AO85. (Attachments: #1 AO85)(MSB)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 08/18/2021. Sent to petitioner via USPS on 08/18/2021. (MSB)
August 18, 2021 TEXT CERTIFICATE OF CLERK - The Clerk has served an AO85 and a copy/copies of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2241), #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on the Respondent, Petitioner via USPS and the following: - United States Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20530-0001, via certified mail, return receipt requested; - Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons,320 First St., NW, Washington, DC 20534, via certified mail, return receipt requested; - Diana Ryan, Assistant United States Attorney for the District of South Dakota, Civil Division, via electronic delivery. (MSB)
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PETITIONER: The Clerks Office has received your Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 together with a Motion to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Declaration. Although a new case has been opened, your motion to proceed without prepayment of fees may be denied unless you return the enclosed Prisoner Trust Account Report (to be completed by the institution where you are incarcerated.) Copy of docket sheet and Prisoner Trust Account Report sent to petitioner. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (MSB)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION For Emergency Order For Immediate RRC Submission Under the Second Chance Act Law Due to BOP Failure by Donald O. Fazel. (MSB)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald O. Fazel. (MSB)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2241. (Attachments: #1 BOP Documents) (MSB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fazel v. Yankton FPC Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donald O. Fazel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Yankton FPC Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: K. Bennett
Represented By: Alison J. Ramsdell
Represented By: Civil United States Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?