Slason et al v. The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stillman Slason and Marlene Slason
Defendant: The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. and Trumball Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv04151
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Trumball Insurance Company. (Smiley, Jason)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Francis J. Maloney, III for The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. and for Trumball Insurance Company. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/14/2021. (JLS)
October 14, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney Francis J. Maloney, III to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3648720) by The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Trumball Insurance Company. (Smiley, Jason)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/12/2021. (JLS)
October 11, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Smiley, Jason)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. answer due 10/11/2021; Trumball Insurance Company answer due 10/11/2021. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/21/2021. (JLS)
October 1, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by All Defendants. (Smiley, Jason)
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Trumball Insurance Company. (Smiley, Jason)
September 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Trumball Insurance Company . (Smiley, Jason)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued, Acknowledgement filed by Marlene Slason, Stillman Slason. (Abdallah, Scott)
September 13, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, Memorandum, Summons & Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge served on Gary Scappini - Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. on 09/03/2021, filed by Marlene Slason, Stillman Slason. (Abdallah, Scott)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Hartford Financial Group, Inc. and Trumball Insurance Company. 2 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. Summons, #2 Trumball Insurance Co. Summons, #3 AO85)(MSB)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402.00 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3618198, in shell case on 08/27/2021 filed by Stillman Slason and Marlene Slason on 08/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Policy, #2 Ex. B - Accident Report, #3 Ex. C - Letter (7-13-21), #4 Ex. D - Letter (7-21-21)) (MSB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slason et al v. The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stillman Slason
Represented By: Sara E. Show
Represented By: Scott A. Abdallah
Represented By: Steven L. Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Slason
Represented By: Sara E. Show
Represented By: Scott A. Abdallah
Represented By: Steven L. Pier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Francis J. Maloney, III
Represented By: Jason M. Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trumball Insurance Company
Represented By: Francis J. Maloney, III
Represented By: Jason M. Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?