Dr. William Horner v. Bayer AG et al
Plaintiff: Dr. William Horner
Defendant: Bayer AG and Bayer Cropscience Holding Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv04152
Filed: September 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 12 Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of California. (VMM)
September 29, 2021 Filing 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - Transfer of case to the Northern District of California. (VMM)
September 16, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons (with AO85 and Consent) and Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial served on Registered Agent of Bayer CropScience Holding Inc. on 9/13/2021, filed by Dr. William Horner. (Nelsen, Derek)
September 16, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons (with AO85 and Consent) and Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial served on Registered Agent of Bayer Ag on 9/13/2021, filed by Dr. William Horner. (Nelsen, Derek)
September 10, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Six Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, a copy of Fed.R.Civ.P.4, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Bayer Cropscience Holding - Pierre, #2 Bayer AG- Tallahassee, #3 Bayer AG - Germany, #4 Bayer AG - Whippany, #5 Bayer AG- Pittsburg, #6 Bayer AG- Pierre, #7 AO 85)(VMM)
September 10, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Dr. William Horner. (Nelsen, Derek)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Dr. William Horner. (Nelsen, Derek)
September 10, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Dr. William Horner. (Nelsen, Derek)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Dr. William Horner. (Nelsen, Derek)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Dr. William Horner. (Nelsen, Derek)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Dr. William Horner. (Nelsen, Derek)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402.00 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3621189, in shell case on 09/01/2021 filed by Dr. William Horner on 09/01/2021. (VMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dr. William Horner v. Bayer AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. William Horner
Represented By: Derek A. Nelsen
Represented By: Eric T. Preheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Cropscience Holding Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?