Christians v. Clark et al
Petitioner: Mark Anthony Christians
Respondent: Doug Clark and The Attorney General of the State of South Dakota
Case Number: 4:2021cv04159
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Filing 8 RECEIVED Minnehaha County Cases CR12-0076 and CIV15-1993. ; Received SD Supreme Court cases 26853 and 29623. Documents are on Clerk of Courts N Drive. (JLS)
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 BRIEF by Respondents Doug Clark, The Attorney General of the State of South Dakota re #6 Response,, #5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Templar, Matthew)
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Doug Clark, The Attorney General of the State of South Dakota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Judgment, #2 Exhibit Notice of Appeal, #3 Exhibit Brief, #4 Exhibit Brief, #5 Exhibit Brief, #6 Exhibit Order, #7 Exhibit Petition, #8 Exhibit Brief, #9 Exhibit Amended Petition, #10 Exhibit Motion, #11 Exhibit Opinion, #12 Exhibit Motion, #13 Exhibit Order, #14 Exhibit Motion, #15 Exhibit Order) (Templar, Matthew)
October 26, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Doug Clark, The Attorney General of the State of South Dakota. (Templar, Matthew)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W. Templar on behalf of Doug Clark, The Attorney General of the State of South Dakota. (Templar, Matthew)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Service. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 09/28/2021. (VMM) Modified on 9/28/2021 mailed to Mark Christians via USPS(VMM).
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PETITIONER: The Clerks Office has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Although a new case has been opened, your case cannot proceed further until you either pay the filing fee OR complete and return the enclosed Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Declaration AND Prisoner Trust Account Report (to be completed by the institution where you are incarcerated.). Copy of docket sheet, motion to proceed IFP, and Prisoner Trust Account form sent to petitioner. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (MSB)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Certificate of Service) (MSB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christians v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Anthony Christians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Doug Clark
Represented By: Matthew W. Templar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of South Dakota
Represented By: Matthew W. Templar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?