Ireland v. Midwest Employers Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Crystal Ireland
Defendant: Midwest Employers Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2022cv04007
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 2/17/2022. (CLR)
February 16, 2022 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Midwest Employers Casualty Company (O'Hara, Gillian)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 2/10/2022. (SLT)
February 9, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Midwest Employers Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy) (O'Hara, Gillian)
January 27, 2022 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint Acknowledgement filed by Crystal Ireland. (Abdallah, Scott)
January 19, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crystal Ireland. Midwest Employers Casualty Company served on 1/19/2022, answer due 2/9/2022. (Abdallah, Scott)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Midwest Employers Casualty Company. 1 Summons, a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(CLR)
January 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3708706, in shell case on 1/18/2022 filed by Crystal Ireland on 1/18/2022. (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ireland v. Midwest Employers Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Ireland
Represented By: Scott A. Abdallah
Represented By: Michael J. Simpson
Represented By: Sara E. Show
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Employers Casualty Company
Represented By: Gillian G. O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?