Espinoza v. Fowler
Plaintiff: Carlos Espinoza
Defendant: Jedidiah Fowler
Case Number: 4:2022cv04068
Filed: May 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2022 Filing 8 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/29/2023 Motions due by 7/28/2023. (KLE)
July 14, 2022 Filing 7 Discovery Report AND SCHEDULING INFORMATION by Jedidiah Fowler.(Arndt, Mark)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 06/16/2022. (KLE)
June 15, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jedidiah Fowler. (Arndt, Mark)
June 15, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Arndt on behalf of Jedidiah Fowler. (Arndt, Mark)
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Jedidiah Fowler served on 05/27/2022. (Martinez, Dillon)
May 23, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jedidiah Fowler. 1 Summons, a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(CLR)
May 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3798020, in shell case on 5/23/2022 filed by Carlos Espinoza on 5/23/2022. (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinoza v. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Espinoza
Represented By: Dillon Martinez
Represented By: Seamus Culhane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jedidiah Fowler
Represented By: Mark J. Arndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?