Karen Ahlschlager et al v. Braga Fresh Family Farms, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Karen Ahlschlager and Donald Ahlschlager
Defendant: Braga Fresh Family Farms, Inc. doing business as Josie's Organics, Hy-Vee, Inc. and Braga Fresh Family Farms, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Josie's Organics
Cross Defendant: Braga Fresh Family Farms, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv04159
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER for Discovery Report. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/23/2023. (ARW)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Bratkiewicz on behalf of Braga Fresh Family Farms, Inc.. (Bratkiewicz, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn J. Hoskins on behalf of Braga Fresh Family Farms, Inc.. (Hoskins, Kathryn) Modified on 8/23/2023 (SLT).
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against Braga Fresh Family Farms, Inc. by Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Sale Agreement) (Linebaugh, Jesse)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Eleanor Gray for Donald Ahlschlager,Eleanor Gray for Karen Ahlschlager. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/23/2023. (ARW)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Braga Fresh Family Farms, Inc.. (Hoskins, Kathryn)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Filing Error: #31 Notice of Appearance was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Hoskins, Kathryn)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Attorney Eleanor Gray to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4103848) by Donald Ahlschlager, Karen Ahlschlager. (Abdallah, Scott)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert L. Sallendar, Jr for Braga Fresh Family Farms, Inc.. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 08/17/2023. (SAC)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Attorney Robert L. Sallander to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4100502) by Braga Fresh Family Farms, Inc.. (Hoskins, Kathryn)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION denying #8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/9/2023. (ARW)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Hy-Vee, Inc. must Answer or otherwise respond no later than 14 days after the court rules on Braga Fresh Family Farms motion to dismiss. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 04/27/23. (VMM)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Linebaugh, Jesse)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 BRIEF by Defendant Braga Fresh Family Farms, Inc. In Support of Motion to Dismiss (Hoskins, Kathryn)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lance W. Lange for Hy-Vee, Inc.; granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Elizabeth J. Carter for Hy-Vee, Inc.. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 02/01/2023. (VMM)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney Elizabeth J. Carter to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3962207) by Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Linebaugh, Jesse)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney Lance W. Lange to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3962190) by Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Linebaugh, Jesse)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Hy-Vee, Inc. answer due 5/1/2023. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 01/31/2023. (VMM) Modified docket text on 1/31/2023 (VMM).
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Linebaugh, Jesse)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Plead by Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer) (Linebaugh, Jesse)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse J.E. Linebaugh on behalf of Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Linebaugh, Jesse)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECLARATION of Karen Ahlschlager re #12 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Display Photo) (Abdallah, Scott)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Donald Ahlschlager, Karen Ahlschlager. (Abdallah, Scott)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney by Donald Ahlschlager, Karen Ahlschlager. Attorney Lindsay Lien Rinholen terminated. (Schoenbeck Byre, Erin)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Braga Fresh Family Farms, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Braga Fresh Family Farms, Inc. for Braga Fresh Family Farms, Inc.. (Hoskins, Kathryn)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 BRIEF re #8 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Braga Fresh Family Farms, Inc. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS (Hoskins, Kathryn) Modified to add link on 1/9/2023 (SLW).
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by Braga Fresh Family Farms, Inc.. (Hoskins, Kathryn)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECLARATION of Laura Penera . (Hoskins, Kathryn)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn J. Hoskins on behalf of Braga Fresh Family Farms, Inc.. (Hoskins, Kathryn)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brendan J. Flaherty for Donald Ahlschlager and Karen Ahlschlager; granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lindsay Lien Rinholen for Donald Ahlschlager and Karen Ahlschlager. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/15/2022. (VMM)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Lindsay Lien Rinholen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3918821) by Donald Ahlschlager, Karen Ahlschlager. (Abdallah, Scott)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney Brendan J. Flaherty to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3918819) by Donald Ahlschlager, Karen Ahlschlager. (Abdallah, Scott)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. 2 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. (VMM) CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms.
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3918599, in shell case on 11/15/2022 filed by Karen Ahlschlager, Donald Ahlschlager on 11/15/2022. (VMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karen Ahlschlager et al v. Braga Fresh Family Farms, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Ahlschlager
Represented By: Erin Schoenbeck Byre
Represented By: Scott A. Abdallah
Represented By: Lindsay Lien Rinholen
Represented By: Brendan J. Flaherty
Represented By: Eleanor Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Ahlschlager
Represented By: Erin Schoenbeck Byre
Represented By: Scott A. Abdallah
Represented By: Brendan J. Flaherty
Represented By: Lindsay Lien Rinholen
Represented By: Eleanor Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Braga Fresh Family Farms, Inc. doing business as Josie's Organics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Represented By: Jesse J.E. Linebaugh
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Carter
Represented By: Lance W. Lange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Braga Fresh Family Farms, Inc. a California corporation doing business as Josie's Organics
Represented By: Kathryn J. Hoskins
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Bratkiewicz
Represented By: Robert L. Sallendar, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Braga Fresh Family Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Bratkiewicz
Represented By: Robert L. Sallendar, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?