Leffring v. CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Todd Leffring
Defendant: CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company doing business as AAA Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2023cv04010
Filed: January 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/19/2024 Motions due by 5/17/2024. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on March 15, 2023. (DLC)
March 15, 2023 Filing 8 Discovery Report by CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company.(Wosje, Jennifer)
February 22, 2023 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Wosje, Jennifer)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Discovery Report. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 2/14/2023. (ARW)
February 14, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Wosje, Jennifer)
February 3, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Wosje on behalf of CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. (Wosje, Jennifer)
January 26, 2023 Filing 3 ADMISSION of Service of Summons and Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial (with Exhibits) served on South Dakota Division of Insurance o/b/a CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company d/b/a AAA Insurance Company on January 24, 2023, filed by Todd Leffring. (Preheim, Eric)
January 19, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company. 1 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel.. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (DLC)
January 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402.00 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3953150, in shell case on 01/19/2023 filed by Todd Leffring on 01/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Photograph of vehicle, #2 Exhibit 2 12/16/20 Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Medical Bill) (DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leffring v. CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Leffring
Represented By: Derek A. Nelsen
Represented By: Eric T. Preheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSAA Fire & Casualty Insurance Company doing business as AAA Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer L. Wosje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?