Lausen v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Amy Lausen
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2023cv04011
Filed: January 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2023 Filing 4 ADMISSION of Service of Summons and Complaint served on United States Attorney for the District of South Dakota on 1/19/2023, filed by Amy Lausen. (Druley, Delia)
January 25, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana J. Ryan on behalf of United States of America. (Ryan, Diana)
January 19, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es) delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiff's attorney. (SAC)
January 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, $402 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3953241, in shell case on 01/19/2023 filed by Amy Lausen on 01/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (SAC) Modified on 1/19/2023 - restricted attachment to case participants per E-Gov't Act information contained within document (SAC).
January 19, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lausen v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Lausen
Represented By: Delia M. Druley
Represented By: Tyler Haigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Diana J. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?