Scott v. Carpenter et al
Plaintiff: La'Shane Donyale Scott and La
Defendant: Dr. Mary Carpenter, Warden Dan Sullivan, Nurse Lana, Ryan Vanderaa, Jason Mills, Sgt. Swaggert, Officer Gangler, Kayla Tinker, Charge Nurse Stephanie, Unknown Officers, Unknown Health Services Nursing Staff and Kellie Wasko
Case Number: 4:2023cv04020
Filed: February 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2023 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff La'Shane Donyale Scott re #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983), #16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (ARW) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/30/2023) (ARW).
March 27, 2023 Filing 20 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff La'Shane Donyale Scott re #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983). (ARW)
March 27, 2023 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff La'Shane Donyale Scott in support of #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) and in support of #16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (ARW)
March 22, 2023 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff La'Shane Donyale Scott re #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983). (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (ARW)
March 22, 2023 Filing 17 BRIEF by Plaintiff La'Shane Donyale Scott in support of #16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (ARW)
March 22, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by La'Shane Donyale Scott. (ARW)
March 14, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend Complaint by La'Shane Donyale Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Attachment to Amended Complaint) (SAC)
March 6, 2023 Filing 14 DECLARATION of La'Shane Donyale Scott in support of #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983). (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (ARW)
March 6, 2023 RECEIPT of Portion of Initial Partial Filing Fee from La'Shane Donyale Scott. Amount Paid: $35.00. Receipt No.: 400001490. (ARW). Modified on 3/6/2023 to include Cover Letter re: Initial partial filing fee (ARW).
March 3, 2023 Filing 13 DECLARATION of La'Shane Donyale Scott in support of #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983). (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (DLC) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/3/2023) (DLC).
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO POSSIBLE GRANT OF LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT denying #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 3/2/2023. (ARW) Modified on 3/3/2023. Sent to La'Shane Donyale Scott via USPS (SKK).
February 28, 2023 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Patrick Wayne DeVare. (DLC)
February 28, 2023 Filing 10 DECLARATION of La'Shane Donyale Scott. (Attachments: #1 attachment) (DLC)
February 28, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Supplemental Complaint re: #1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights. by La'Shane Donyale Scott. (DLC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2023: #1 Cover Letter) (DLC).
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $36.22 is due by 3/21/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 2/21/2023. Sent to La'Shane Donyale Scott and Financial Department at SDSP via USPS. (ARW)
February 17, 2023 Filing 7 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (ARW)
February 16, 2023 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff La'Shane Donyale Scott re #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983). (ARW)
February 13, 2023 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff La'Shane Donyale Scott to #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983). (Attachments: #1 Attachments) (DLC)
February 10, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Civil Rights Complaint together with an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury. Although a new case has been opened, your application to proceed without prepayment of fees may be denied unless you return the enclosed Prisoner Trust Account Report (to be completed by the institution where you are incarcerated.) Copy of docket sheet and Prisoner Trust Account Report sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Pursuant to the E-Government Act and D.S.D. Civ. LR 5.2, you must redact personal identifiers from documents submitted to the Court. The Clerks Office will not review for compliance. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (DLC)
February 9, 2023 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Nathaniel Wright. (DLC)
February 9, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by La'Shane Donyale Scott. (DLC)
February 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights. (Attachments: #1 Attachments (best scan)) (DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Carpenter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La'Shane Donyale Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Mary Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Dan Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Lana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Vanderaa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Swaggert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Gangler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayla Tinker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charge Nurse Stephanie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Health Services Nursing Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellie Wasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?