DFO, LLC v. W & P of Sioux Falls LLC
Plaintiff: DFO, LLC
Defendant: W & P of Sioux Falls LLC doing business as The Den
Case Number: 4:2024cv04002
Filed: January 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2024 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by W & P of Sioux Falls LLC identifying Corporate Parent LaHaise Management, LLC for W & P of Sioux Falls LLC. (Prostrollo, Lisa)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 2/6/24. (SKK)
February 5, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 with Jury Demand by W & P of Sioux Falls LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Denny's Franchise Disclosure Document) (Prostrollo, Lisa)
January 15, 2024 Filing 7 ADMISSION of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Todd LaHaise, Managing Partner of W&P of Sioux Falls LLC on 01/15/2024, filed by DFO, LLC. (Hagen, Alex)
January 3, 2024 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by DFO, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Denny's Corporation, Corporate Parent Denny's, Inc. for DFO, LLC. (Hagen, Alex)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael D. Hobbs for DFO, LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/3/24. (SKK)
January 3, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Michael D. Hobbs Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4191205) by DFO, LLC. (Hagen, Alex)
January 2, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE/REPORT of Filing of Action Regarding Trademark emailed US Patent & Trademark Office. (SKK)
January 2, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to W & P of Sioux Falls LLC. 1 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SKK)
January 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $405 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-4190929, in shell case on 1/2/24 filed by DFO, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: USPTO registration for THE DEN) (SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DFO, LLC v. W & P of Sioux Falls LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DFO, LLC
Represented By: Alex M. Hagen
Represented By: Michael D. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W & P of Sioux Falls LLC doing business as The Den
Represented By: Christopher D. Sommers
Represented By: James E. McMahon
Represented By: Lisa M. Prostrollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?