The Sundance Group, Inc. v. City of Sioux Falls et al
Plaintiff: The Sundance Group, Inc.
Defendant: Kurt A. Peppel, City of Sioux Falls, Paul J. Tenhaken and Aaron J. Fagerness
Case Number: 4:2024cv04124
Filed: June 28, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by City of Sioux Falls, Aaron J. Fagerness, Kurt A. Peppel, Paul J. TenHaken UNOPPOSED. (Moore, James)
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Moore on behalf of All Defendants. (Moore, James)
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Drew Driesen on behalf of City of Sioux Falls, Aaron J. Fagerness, Kurt A. Peppel, Paul J. TenHaken. (Driesen, Drew)
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney as to City of Sioux Falls, Aaron J. Fagerness, Kurt A. Peppel, Paul J. TenHaken. Attorney Roger A. Sudbeck added. Attorney Roger A. Sudbeck terminated. (Sudbeck, Roger)
July 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by City of Sioux Falls, Aaron J. Fagerness, Kurt A. Peppel, Paul J. TenHaken . (Sudbeck, Roger)
July 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger A. Sudbeck on behalf of All Defendants. (Sudbeck, Roger)
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Sundance Group, Inc.. All Defendants. (Ogborn, Michael)
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Sioux Falls, Aaron J. Fagerness, Kurt A. Peppel, Paul J. Tenhaken. 4 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms . (SLT)
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $405 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-4314278, in shell case on 6/28/2024 filed by The Sundance Group, Inc. (SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Sundance Group, Inc. v. City of Sioux Falls et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Sundance Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Jon Ogborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt A. Peppel
Represented By: James E. Moore
Represented By: Drew Driesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sioux Falls
Represented By: James E. Moore
Represented By: Drew Driesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J. Tenhaken
Represented By: James E. Moore
Represented By: Drew Driesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron J. Fagerness
Represented By: James E. Moore
Represented By: Drew Driesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?