Denke v. Brule County, South Dakota et al
Plaintiff: Joshua M. Denke
Defendant: Defendant Does 1-4, Brule County, South Dakota, Christian Casey, Brock Frederick, Lesley Burfeindt, Darrell Miller and Jennifer Forester
Case Number: 4:2024cv04182
Filed: October 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2024 Filing 13 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Request for Trial by Jury by Brule County, South Dakota, Darrell Miller, Lesley Burfeindt, Christian Casey. (Abraham, Douglas)
November 18, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Cash Eric Anderson on behalf of Brule County, South Dakota, Darrell Miller, Lesley Burfeindt, Christian Casey. (Anderson, Cash)
November 18, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas A. Abraham on behalf of Brule County, South Dakota, Darrell Miller, Lesley Burfeindt, Christian Casey. (Abraham, Douglas)
November 18, 2024 NOTICE of Filing Error: #8 Notice of Appearance, #9 Answer to Complaint was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Abraham, Douglas)
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY REPORT AND SCHEDULING INFORMATION. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 11/15/2024. (JMS)
November 14, 2024 Filing 9 (FILED IN ERROR) ANSWER to #1 with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Abraham, Douglas) Modified on 11/19/2024 (SAC).
November 14, 2024 Filing 8 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas A. Abraham on behalf of All Defendants. (Abraham, Douglas) Modified on 11/19/2024 (SAC).
October 28, 2024 Filing 7 ADMISSION of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Christian Casey on 10/24/2024, filed by Joshua M. Denke. (Pochop, Stephanie)
October 28, 2024 Filing 6 ADMISSION of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Darrell Miller on 10/24/2024, filed by Joshua M. Denke. (Pochop, Stephanie)
October 28, 2024 Filing 5 ADMISSION of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Lesley Burfeindt on 10/24/2024, filed by Joshua M. Denke. (Pochop, Stephanie)
October 28, 2024 Filing 4 ADMISSION of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Brule C. Auditor Pamela Petrak on 10/24/2024, filed by Joshua M. Denke. (Pochop, Stephanie)
October 28, 2024 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR) ADMISSION of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Brule Co. Auditor Pamela Petrak on 10/24/2024, filed by Brule County, South Dakota. (Pochop, Stephanie) Modified on 10/30/2024 (SAC).
October 28, 2024 NOTICE of Filing Error: #3 Admission of Service was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Pochop, Stephanie)
October 3, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Brule County, South Dakota, Lesley Burfeindt, Christian Casey, Defendant Does 1-4, Jennifer Forester, Brock Frederick, Darrell Miller. 7 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JMS)
October 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $405 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-4381120, in shell case on 10/02/2024 filed by Joshua M Denke. (JMS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denke v. Brule County, South Dakota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant Does 1-4
Represented By: Douglas A. Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brule County, South Dakota
Represented By: Douglas A. Abraham
Represented By: Cash Eric Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Casey
Represented By: Douglas A. Abraham
Represented By: Cash Eric Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock Frederick
Represented By: Douglas A. Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesley Burfeindt
Represented By: Douglas A. Abraham
Represented By: Cash Eric Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Miller
Represented By: Douglas A. Abraham
Represented By: Cash Eric Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Forester
Represented By: Douglas A. Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua M. Denke
Represented By: Stephanie E. Pochop
Represented By: Gavin D. Pochop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?