Longsoldier v. South Dakota State Penitentiary Warden et al
Petitioner: Damen Longsoldier
Respondent: South Dakota State Penitentiary Warden and The Attorney General for the State of South Dakota
Case Number: 4:2024cv04183
Filed: October 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 11/6/2024. (Mailed to Damen Long Soldier with Post Conviction Appeal Packet)(JLS)
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER adopting #3 Report and Recommendation in Full and Dismissing Petitioner's petition without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 11/5/2024. (Mailed to Damen Long Soldier) (JLS)
October 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE to petitioner Damen Long Soldier: you have a right to appeal the magistrate judge's recommended dismissal of your habeas petition. If you file a notice of appeal within 14 days containing specific factual or legal objections to the magistrate judge's report and recommendation dated October 4, 2024, the district judge will review this matter de novo. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 10/7/24. (Duffy, Veronica) (Mailed to Mr. Longsoldier) Modified docket text on 10/8/2024 (ARW).
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 10/04/2024. Sent to Petition via USPS.(MSB) Modified document type on 10/4/2024 (MSB).
October 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE TO PETITIONER: The Clerks Office has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Although a new case has been opened, your case cannot proceed further until you either pay the filing fee OR complete and return the enclosed Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Declaration AND Prisoner Trust Account Report (to be completed by the institution where you are incarcerated.). Copy of docket sheet, motion to proceed IFP, and Prisoner Trust Account form sent to petitioner. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Pursuant to the E-Government Act and D.S.D. Civ. LR 5.2, you must redact personal identifiers from documents submitted to the Court. The Clerks Office will not review for compliance. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (JLS)
October 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 filed by Damen Longsoldier. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longsoldier v. South Dakota State Penitentiary Warden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: South Dakota State Penitentiary Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General for the State of South Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Damen Longsoldier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?