PRN Health Services LLC v. Independent Health Solutions LLC
Plaintiff: PRN Health Services LLC
Defendant: Independent Health Solutions LLC
Case Number: 4:2024cv04223
Filed: December 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2025 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Independent Health Solutions LLC. Mailed to 1143 Lincoln Ave SW, Huron, SD 57350 and Ashley Kingdon-Reese, 108 Nicollet SWHuron, SD 57350 (MWT)
January 15, 2025 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #9 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by PRN Health Services LLC. (Juarez, Cesar)
January 15, 2025 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Default by PRN Health Services LLC. (Juarez, Cesar)
December 26, 2024 Filing 8 ADMISSION of Service of Summons, Complaint served on Ashley Kingdon, RA for Independent Health Solutions on December 18, 2024, filed by PRN Health Services LLC. (Juarez, Cesar)
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John T.D. Bathke for PRN Health Services LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 12/20/2024. (JLS)
December 19, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney John T.D. Bathke to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4431704) by PRN Health Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Admit Nonresident Attorney) (Juarez, Cesar)
December 16, 2024 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by PRN Health Services LLC. (Juarez, Cesar)
December 16, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Independent Health Solutions LLC. 1 Summons delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (ARW)
December 16, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by PRN Health Services LLC. (Juarez, Cesar)
December 13, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE/REPORT on Determination of Action Regarding Patent or Trademark EMAILED to US Patent & Trademark Office (JLS)
December 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $405.00 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-4428090, in shell case on 12/13/2024 filed by PRN Health Services LLC. (JLS)
December 13, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRN Health Services LLC v. Independent Health Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent Health Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRN Health Services LLC
Represented By: Cesar A. Juarez
Represented By: John T.D. Bathke
Represented By: John T.D. Bathke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?