Poor Bear et al v. The County of Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Poor Bear, Don Doyle, Cheryl D. Bettelyoun and James Red Willow
Defendant: The County of Jackson, The Board of Commissioners for the County of Jackson, Vicki Wilson, Glen Bennett, Larry Denke, Larry Johnston, Jim Stilwell and Ron Twiss
Case Number: 5:2014cv05059
Filed: September 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Western Division Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 96 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/4/17. (SLW)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER granting 45 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 56 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 72 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/17/2016. (JLS)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying as moot 13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying as moot 14 Motion for judicial notice; denying as moot 15 Motion to consolidate; denying 22 Motion to Dismiss. Answer due 5/11/2015. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 5/1/2015. (KC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poor Bear et al v. The County of Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Poor Bear
Represented By: Robert Alvin Kengle
Represented By: Maura Eileen O'Connor
Represented By: Matthew L. Rappold
Represented By: Erik William Snapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Doyle
Represented By: Robert Alvin Kengle
Represented By: Maura Eileen O'Connor
Represented By: Matthew L. Rappold
Represented By: Erik William Snapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl D. Bettelyoun
Represented By: Robert Alvin Kengle
Represented By: Maura Eileen O'Connor
Represented By: Matthew L. Rappold
Represented By: Erik William Snapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Red Willow
Represented By: Robert Alvin Kengle
Represented By: Maura Eileen O'Connor
Represented By: Matthew L. Rappold
Represented By: Erik William Snapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County of Jackson
Represented By: Sara Frankenstein
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Commissioners for the County of Jackson
Represented By: Sara Frankenstein
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Wilson
Represented By: Sara Frankenstein
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Bennett
Represented By: Sara Frankenstein
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Denke
Represented By: Sara Frankenstein
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Johnston
Represented By: Sara Frankenstein
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Stilwell
Represented By: Sara Frankenstein
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Twiss
Represented By: Sara Frankenstein
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?