Wetch v. Crum & Forster Commerical Ins et al
Plaintiff: David Wetch
Defendant: Crum & Forster Commerical Ins., North River Insurance Company and United States Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2017cv05033
Filed: April 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Western Division Office
County: Pennington
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L. Viken
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER denying 59 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; adopting in part, rejecting in part and modifying in part 131 Report and Recommendation; sustaining in part and overruling in part 136 Objection to Report and Recommendation; sustaining in part and overruling in part 137 Objection to Report and Recommendation. Signed by U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 2/25/20. (SB)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting 150 Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 10/29/2019. (CG)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 9/30/19. (SB)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER withdrawing 45 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; withdrawing 45 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; withdrawing 46 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; withdrawing 46 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Ju risdiction; granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 82 Report and Recommendation; withdrawing 83 Objection to Report and Recommendation; withdrawing 106 Objection to Magistrate Judge Order; granting 107 Motion to Withdraw; denying without prejudice as moot 107 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 3/21/19. (SB)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 87 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 1/22/2019. (CG)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER denying as moot 63 Motion to Stay; denying as moot 67 Motion to Extend Deadlines; granting 78 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Defendants' response to plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment due January 15, 2019; plaintiff's reply brief due March 4, 2019. Discovery due by 7/1/2019; Motions due by 8/1/2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 11/15/2018. (CG) Modified docket text on 11/15/2018 (SAC).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wetch v. Crum & Forster Commerical Ins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wetch
Represented By: David S. Barari
Represented By: G. Verne Goodsell
Represented By: Wm. Jason Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crum & Forster Commerical Ins.
Represented By: Jeffery D. Collins
Represented By: Barbara Anderson Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North River Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffery D. Collins
Represented By: Barbara Anderson Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffery D. Collins
Represented By: Barbara Anderson Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?