Lundahl et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank et al

Plaintiff: Logan Lundahl and Holli Lundahl
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, Michele M Christiansen, Mary Corporon, Old Republic Insurance Co., Mel Hoffman, Los Angeles Homeowners Aid, Travis O'Gorman, Derek Weimer, Carol Stouffer, Frankie Moore, Lilia Chavarin, American Modern Insurance Group, Carolyn Olson, Neil Lund, First American Title Insurance Co. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 5:2017cv05069
Filed: September 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Western Division Office
County: Fall River
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L. Piersol
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 31 Motion to Dismiss; granting 34 Motion to Dismiss; granting 34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 36 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 41 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying as moot 45 Motion for Joinder; denying as moot 55 Motion for Joinder; denying as moot 63 Motion for Joinder; denying 88 Motion to Amend Original Complaint. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 8/12/2019. (CLR)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying Plaintiff's motions to amend and/or supplement complaint 73 74 ; Plaintiff's motion to seal 73 , 74 , and 77 are granted; Plaintiff's shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a motion to amend complaint. If plaintiffs do not file an amended complaint, this court will proceed with its screening of plaintiffs amended complaint at docket 27 . Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 12/21/2018. (SAC)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying 16 Second Motion to Electronically File Documents in CM/ECF. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 8/24/18. (SLW)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT IN PART AND DIRECTING SERVICE IN PART, granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 8 Motion to Electronically File Documents in CM/ECF ; denying 9 Motion to Electronically File Documents in CM/ECF; denying 12 Motion to Seal Document; denying 13 Motion for judicial notice, dismissing Michele M. Christiansen, Travis O'Gorman, Derek Weimer, Carol Stouffer, Frankie Moore, Carolyn Olsen, Neil Lund and Mary Corporon. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 8/2/18. (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundahl et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Logan Lundahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holli Lundahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele M Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Corporon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mel Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Homeowners Aid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis O'Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Weimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Stouffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frankie Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lilia Chavarin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Modern Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Lund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?