Brown et al v. Continental Resources, Inc.

Plaintiff: Tracy L. Brown and Timothy G. Brown
Defendant: Continental Resources, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv05048
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Western Division Office
County: Harding
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Filing 22 REPLY to Motion Response re #6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Continental Resources, Inc.. (Collins, Jeffery)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Defendant's response due by 9/11/2018. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/5/18. (DJP)
September 4, 2018 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadlines by Continental Resources, Inc.. (Collins, Jeffery)
August 21, 2018 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim of Tim Brown filed by Timothy G. Brown, Tracy L. Brown. (Barker, Kenneth) Modified text on 8/22/2018 (SST).
August 21, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Timothy G. Brown, Tracy L. Brown. (Barker, Kenneth) Modified text on 8/22/2018 (SST).
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Extend. Plaintiffs will file a response to defendant's motion to dismiss on or before Tuesday, August 21, 2018. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/16/18. (DJP)
August 15, 2018 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Extend re #6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Timothy G. Brown, Tracy L. Brown. (Barker, Kenneth)
August 15, 2018 NOTICE of Filing Error: #15 Motion to Extend Deadlines was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Barker, Kenneth)
August 15, 2018 Filing 15 (FILED IN ERROR) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadlines to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Timothy G. Brown, Tracy L. Brown. (Barker, Kenneth) Modified on 8/15/2018 to add text and terminate motion (KLK).
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas Ryan-Lang. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/8/18. (DJP)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul R. Taylor. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/8/18. (DJP)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bradley S. Keller. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/8/18. (DJP)
August 7, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney Paul R. Taylor to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2846017) by Continental Resources, Inc.. (Collins, Jeffery)
August 7, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney Nicholas Ryan-Lang to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2846015) by Continental Resources, Inc.. (Collins, Jeffery)
August 7, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney Bradley S. Keller to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2846013) by Continental Resources, Inc.. (Collins, Jeffery)
August 3, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim (Supplemental) filed by Continental Resources, Inc.. (Collins, Jeffery)
July 26, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Continental Resources, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Surface Use Drilling Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Pipeline Agreement) (Collins, Jeffery)
July 26, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by Continental Resources, Inc.. (Collins, Jeffery)
July 25, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Continental Resources, Inc.. (Collins, Jeffery)
July 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Fritz on behalf of Continental Resources, Inc.. (Fritz, Thomas)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 RULE 73 MEMO. (Attachments: #1 AO-85)(SLT)
July 19, 2018 Filing Fee Received from Continental Resources, Inc. Fee Amount: $400.00, Receipt No.: #0869-2832665. (SLT)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SLT)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Continental Resources, Inc. from Fourth Judicial Circuit Court - Harding County, case number 31CIV18-00__. Filed in shell case on 7/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Documents filed in Circuit Court action, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Continental Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas G. Fritz
Represented By: Jeffery D. Collins
Represented By: Paul R. Taylor
Represented By: Bradley S. Keller
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan-Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy L. Brown
Represented By: Kenneth E. Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy G. Brown
Represented By: Kenneth E. Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?