Lewis v. Seventh Circuit Court - South Dakota Unified Judicial System et al

Plaintiff: Aimee Lewis
Defendant: Janice Gednalske, Joshua Gednalske, Seventh Circuit Court - South Dakota Unified Judicial System, Debra Watson, Dwayne Gednalske, Pennington County Sheriff's Department and Rapid City Police Department
Case Number: 5:2018cv05071
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Referring Judge: Daneta Wollmann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 42 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint, #15 MOTION to DISMISS Pursuant to FRCP12(B), #27 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim, #29 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim, #32 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim, and #35 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim. Objections to R&R due by 12/12/2018. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Daneta Wollmann on 11/28/18. (Wollmann, Daneta) (mailed to Plaintiff at PO Box and N. Lacrosse St. address) Modified on 11/28/2018 (TAL).
November 26, 2018 Filing 41 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Aimee Lewis re #1 Complaint. (SLT)
November 26, 2018 Filing 40 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Aimee Lewis re #1 Complaint and #39 Supplement. (SLT)
November 21, 2018 Filing 39 SUPPLEMENT. (SLW) Modified on 11/21/2018 to restrict to case participants (names juvenile) (SLW). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2018: #1 Supplement with Defendant's signature) (SLT).
November 16, 2018 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re #37 MOTION and Pleading of Plaintiff - Seventh Circuit Court - South Dakota Unified Judicial System et al. filed by Debra Watson. (Duffy, Daniel)
October 26, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION and Pleading of Plaintiff - Seventh Circuit Court - South Dakota Unified Judicial System et al. by Aimee Lewis. (SLW)
October 24, 2018 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Support re #35 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Rapid City Police Department. (Galbraith, Robert)
October 24, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by Rapid City Police Department. (Galbraith, Robert)
October 22, 2018 Filing 34 OBJECTION by Plaintiff Aimee Lewis re #22 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Attachment: Order of Referral) (KLE)
October 22, 2018 Filing 33 REDACTED DOCUMENT by Aimee Lewis. Redacted version of previously filed document #21 MOTION and Pleading of Plaintiff- Seventh Circuit Court-South Dakota Unified Judicial System et al re #1 Complaint. (KLE)
October 22, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by Dwayne Gednalske, Janice Gednalske, Joshua Gednalske. (KLE)
October 19, 2018 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #29 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Debra Watson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Court Order Regarding Interim Custody and Parenting Time) (Duffy, Daniel)
October 19, 2018 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support re #29 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Debra Watson. (Duffy, Daniel)
October 19, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by Debra Watson. (Duffy, Daniel)
October 19, 2018 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim and lack of subject matter jurisdiction filed by Pennington County Sheriff's Department. (Mann, Rebecca)
October 19, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim and lack of subject matter jurisdiction by Pennington County Sheriff's Department. (Mann, Rebecca)
October 19, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Crisman Palmer on behalf of Pennington County Sheriff's Department. (Palmer, J.)
October 19, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca L. Mann on behalf of Pennington County Sheriff's Department. (Mann, Rebecca)
October 19, 2018 Filing 24 REPLY to #21 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, filed by Seventh Circuit Court - South Dakota Unified Judicial System. (Anderson, Robert)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall restrict access to #21 Motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2 and D.S.D. Civ. LR 5.2. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 10/18/18. (SB)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to U.S. Magistrate Judge Daneta Wollmann. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 10/18/18. (SB)
October 16, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION and Pleading of Plaintiff- Seventh Circuit Court-South Dakota Unified Judicial System et al re #1 Complaint by Aimee Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1: Chapter 21-Civil Rights, #2 Attachment 2: DHS Report, #3 Attachment 3: Police Report, #4 Attachment 4: Correspondence between Joshua and Aimee, #5 Attachment 5: Part of unneeded shelter order, #6 Attachment 6: Civil Rights Violations, #7 Attachment 7: SD Law and Civil Rights Violations, #8 Attachment 8: Part of Watson's participation in Civil Rights Violations, #9 Attachment 9: Civil Rights Violations, #10 Attachment 10: Parent/Child safety concerns with Joshua Gednalske, #11 Attachment 11: Child/Parent Safety Concerns, #12 Attachment 12: Civil Rights Violations) (KLE)
October 12, 2018 Filing 20 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Seventh Circuit Court - South Dakota Unified Judicial System re #16 Memorandum in Support of Motion . (Anderson, Robert)
October 11, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address by Aimee Lewis (SLT)
October 11, 2018 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Aimee Lewis re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Threatening Retaliatory E-mail, #2 Attachment 2 10/3/2018 email at 11:41 a.m., #3 Attachment 3 10/3/2018 email at 12:22 a.m., #4 Attachment 4 10/2/2018 email at 11:10 p.m., #5 Attachment 5 10/2/2018 email at 10:19 p.m., #6 Attachment 6 10/2/2018 email at 3:47 p.m., #7 Attachment 7 9/28/2018 email at 3:30 p.m., #8 Attachment 8 9/27/2018 email at 4:16 p.m., #9 Attachment 9 9/27/2018 email at 2:57 p.m., #10 Attachment 10 9/27/2018 email at 2:49 p.m., #11 Attachment 11 9/27/2018 email at 8:35 a.m., #12 Attachment 12 9/26/2018 email at 2:18 p.m., #13 Attachment 13 9/23/2018 email at 5:46 p.m., #14 Attachment 14 9/22/2018 email at 12:31 a.m., #15 Attachment 15 9/21/2018 email at 10:04 a.m.) (SLT)
October 11, 2018 NOTICE of Filing Error: #17 Letter Received was filed in error and should be disregarded. (SLT)
October 11, 2018 Filing 17 (FILED IN ERROR) LETTER Received from Aimee Lewis to Honorable Jeffrey L. Viken. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Threatening Retaliatory E-mail) (SLT) Modified on 10/11/2018 (SLT).
October 10, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to DISMISS Pursuant to FRCP12(B) filed by Seventh Circuit Court - South Dakota Unified Judicial System. (Anderson, Robert)
October 10, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to DISMISS Pursuant to FRCP12(B) by Seventh Circuit Court - South Dakota Unified Judicial System. (Anderson, Robert)
October 10, 2018 NOTICE of Filing Error: #9 Return of Service was filed in error and should be disregarded. (SST)
October 9, 2018 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Pennington County Sheriff's Department served on 10/3/18. (SST)
October 9, 2018 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Janice Gednalske served on 10/2/18. (SST)
October 9, 2018 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Dwayne Gednalske served on 10/2/18. (SST)
October 9, 2018 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Joshua Gednalske served on 10/2/18. (SST)
October 9, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Debra Watson served on 10/3/18. (SST)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 (FILED IN ERROR - DUPLICATE OF DOC. 7) RETURN OF SERVICE as to Seventh Circuit Court - South Dakota Unified Judicial System served on 10/3/18. (SST) Modified Docket Text on 10/10/2018 (DLC).
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Rapid City Police Department served on 10/3/18. (SST)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Seventh Circuit Court - South Dakota Unified Judicial System served on 10/3/18. (SST)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 Separate ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Seventh Circuit Court - South Dakota Unified Judicial System. (Anderson, Robert)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 New Case LETTER with enclosed Docket Sheet, copy of Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and CM/ECF Pro Se Litigant Application Form sent by Clerk's Office to Aimee Lewis. (SLT)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dwayne Gednalske, Janice Gednalske, Joshua Gednalske, Pennington County Sheriff's Department, Rapid City Police Department, Seventh Circuit Court - South Dakota Unified Judicial System, Debra Watson. 7 original summons, 8 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff via hand-delivery at case filing. (SLT)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 Filing Fee Received from Aimee Lewis. Fee Amount: $400.00, Receipt No.: #SDX500005450. (SLT)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SLT)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Aimee Lewis. (SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Seventh Circuit Court - South Dakota Unified Judicial System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Gednalske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Gednalske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seventh Circuit Court - South Dakota Unified Judicial System
Represented By: Robert B. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Watson
Represented By: Benjamin D. Tronnes
Represented By: Daniel F. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Gednalske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennington County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mann
Represented By: J. Crisman Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid City Police Department
Represented By: Robert J. Galbraith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aimee Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?