Johnson v. Acuity Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Lloyd Curtis Johnson
Defendant: Acuity Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2018cv05076
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney David J. Nowak to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2943913) by Acuity Mutual Insurance Company. (Fritz, Thomas)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Acuity Mutual Insurance Company. (Fritz, Thomas)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Acuity Mutual Insurance Company. (Fritz, Thomas)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Anderson Lewis on behalf of Acuity Mutual Insurance Company. (Lewis, Barbara)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Fritz on behalf of Acuity Mutual Insurance Company. (Fritz, Thomas)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 ADMISSION OF SERVICE Executed November 8, 2018. Admission filed by Lloyd Curtis Johnson. (Beardsley, Michael) Modified text on 11/19/2018 (DJP).
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Acuity Mutual Insurance Company. 1 original summons, 2 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Attachment AO 85)(SST)
October 31, 2018 Filing Fee Received from Lloyd Curtis Johnson. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #0869-2910714. (SST)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SST)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Lloyd Curtis Johnson in shell case on 10/31/18. (SST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Acuity Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Curtis Johnson
Represented By: Michael S. Beardsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acuity Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Barbara Anderson Lewis
Represented By: Thomas G. Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?