Noethe et al v. Regional Health Network, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Noethe and Christina M. Noethe
Defendant: Regional Health Physicians, Inc., Steven I. Benn, M.D., Rapid City Regional Hospital, Inc., Regional Health, Inc., Regional Health Network, Inc. and Rebecca L. Knudson, M.D.
Case Number: 5:2018cv05082
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Rebecca L. Knudson, MD. (Duffy, Daniel)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 12/7/18. (SB)
December 7, 2018 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Christina M. Noethe, Joseph Noethe served on Rebecca L. Knudson, M.D.. (Hughes, John)
December 7, 2018 Filing 14 SEPARATE ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Steven I. Benn, MD. (Hinton, Melissa)
December 6, 2018 Filing 13 SEPARATE ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Rapid City Regional Hospital, Inc., Regional Health Network, Inc., Regional Health Physicians, Inc., Regional Health, Inc.. (Braun, Lonnie)
December 6, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa C. Hinton on behalf of Steven I. Benn, MD. (Hinton, Melissa)
November 28, 2018 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Christina M. Noethe, Joseph Noethe served on Steven I. Benn, M.D.. (Hughes, John)
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 Filed in error: RETURN OF SERVICE as to Christina M. Noethe, Joseph Noethe served on Steven I. Benn, M.D.. (Hughes, John) Modified on 11/29/2018 (SLW).
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Christina M. Noethe, Joseph Noethe served on Regional Health Physicians, Inc.. (Hughes, John)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Christina M. Noethe, Joseph Noethe served on Rapid City Regional Hospital, Inc.. (Hughes, John)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Christina M. Noethe, Joseph Noethe served on Regional Health, Inc.. (Hughes, John)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Christina M. Noethe, Joseph Noethe served on Regional Health Network, Inc.. (Hughes, John)
November 28, 2018 NOTICE of Filing Error: #10 Return of Service was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Hughes, John)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer L. Keel; granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew R. Laird. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 11/26/18. (SB)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Matthew R. Laird to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2919750) by Christina M. Noethe, Joseph Noethe. (Hughes, John)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney Jennifer L. Keel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2919728) by Christina M. Noethe, Joseph Noethe. (Hughes, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Steven I. Benn, MD, Rebecca L. Knudson, MD, Rapid City Regional Hospital, Inc., Regional Health Network, Inc., Regional Health Physicians, Inc., Regional Health, Inc. 6 original summons, 1 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO85 Form)(SAC)
November 13, 2018 Filing Fee Received from Christina M. Noethe, Joseph Noethe. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #0869-2918384. (SAC)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Joseph Noethe andChristina M. Noethe, in shell case on 11/12/2018. (SAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noethe et al v. Regional Health Network, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Health Physicians, Inc.
Represented By: Lonnie R. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven I. Benn, M.D.
Represented By: Melissa C. Hinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid City Regional Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Lonnie R. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Health, Inc.
Represented By: Lonnie R. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Health Network, Inc.
Represented By: Lonnie R. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca L. Knudson, M.D.
Represented By: Daniel F. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Noethe
Represented By: John R. Hughes
Represented By: Jennifer L. Keel
Represented By: Matthew R. Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina M. Noethe
Represented By: John R. Hughes
Represented By: Jennifer L. Keel
Represented By: Matthew R. Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?