Witt v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA et al

Plaintiff: Roberta Witt
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Case Number: 5:2019cv05004
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/7/19. (JLS)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sedgwick, LP, Corporate Parent Sedgwick Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Lightning Cayman Merger Sub, Ltd, Corporate Parent Stone Point Capital, Corporate Parent CDPQ (Caisse de depot et placement du Quebec), Corporate Parent The Carlyle Group for Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Hieb, Jack)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Hieb, Jack)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. Unopposed. (Hieb, Jack)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA identifying Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Eden, Shane)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 Separate ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Eden, Shane)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane E. Eden on behalf of National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Eden, Shane)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack H. Hieb on behalf of Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Hieb, Jack)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint & Civil Cover Sheet served on Derrick Hacket-CT Corporation Systems (authorized to accept service on behalf of Def. Sedgwick) on 1/23/19, filed by Roberta Witt. (Abdallah, Scott)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Summons Issued, #2 Complaint (Def. National Union) Acknowledgement filed by Roberta Witt. (Abdallah, Scott)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Roberta Witt in shell case on 1/15/19. (JLS)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 Summons Issued as to National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. 2 original summons, A085, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, #2 Summons Issued - Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., #3 AO85)(JLS)
January 15, 2019 Filing Fee Received from Roberta Witt. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #0869-2963236. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Witt v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Witt
Represented By: Shannon R. Falon
Represented By: Scott A. Abdallah
Represented By: Michael J. Simpson
Represented By: Sara E. Show
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jack H. Hieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Shane E. Eden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?