Rathke v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Terry Rathke
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2019cv05006
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Referring Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nancy Berryhill answer due 4/24/2019. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/20/19. (SKK)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Nancy Berryhill. (Donovan, SaraBeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 Admission of Service filed by Terry Rathke. (Julius, Margo) Modified text on 2/12/2019 (DJP).
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by SaraBeth Donovan on behalf of Nancy Berryhill. (Donovan, SaraBeth)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill in their official capacities. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85 Form)(SKK)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/31/19. (SKK)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED Affidavit in Support of #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Terry Rathke. (Julius, Margo) Modified on 1/29/2019 (DJP).
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (SKK)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Terry Rathke. (SKK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (SKK).
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT on Social Security Appeal filed by Terry Rathke. (SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rathke v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel - Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: SaraBeth Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Rathke
Represented By: Margo Tschetter Julius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?