Swiftbird v. Pennington County Jail
Plaintiff: Samuel Swiftbird
Defendant: Pennington County Jail, John Does 1 through 10, Brooke Haga and Rob Yantis
Case Number: 5:2019cv05008
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Seal Document by Brooke Haga, Rob Yantis. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Exhibit 2) (KLE)
April 5, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #16 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Brooke Haga, Rob Yantis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Inmate Handbook, #2 Exhibit 2 - Grievances, #3 Exhibit 3 - Grievance Procedure) (Mann, Rebecca)
April 5, 2019 NOTICE of Filing Error: #18 Affidavit in Support of Motion was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Mann, Rebecca)
April 4, 2019 Filing 18 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #16 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Brooke Haga, Rob Yantis. (Mann, Rebecca) Modified on 4/5/2019 (SLT).
April 4, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Brooke Haga, Rob Yantis. (Mann, Rebecca)
April 4, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by Brooke Haga, Rob Yantis. (Mann, Rebecca)
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Brooke Haga, Rob Yantis . (Mann, Rebecca)
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca L. Mann on behalf of Brooke Haga, Rob Yantis. (Mann, Rebecca)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Crisman Palmer on behalf of Brooke Haga, Rob Yantis. (Palmer, J.)
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address as to Samuel Swiftbird. Sent #9 Order to South Dakota State Penitentiary Financial Department. (KLE)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Brooke Haga, Rob Yantis. Rule 73 memo, summonses, and A0 85 delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summonses, #2 A0 85)(SST)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Samuel Swiftbird. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Leach, James)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 3/4/19. (SB) Modified to Pennington County Jail Financial Office on 3/5/2019 (SST).
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (SKK)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SKK)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Samuel Swiftbird. (Leach, James)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 2/22/19. (SB) Mailed to Samuel Swiftbird on 2/25/2019 (SST).
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 New Case LETTER with enclosed docket sheet sent by Clerk's Office to Samuel Swiftbird. (KLE)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (KLE)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Samuel Swiftbird. (KLE)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights filed by Samuel Swiftbird. (KLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swiftbird v. Pennington County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Swiftbird
Represented By: James D. Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennington County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooke Haga
Represented By: J. Crisman Palmer
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Yantis
Represented By: J. Crisman Palmer
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?