Richardson v. Richardson et al
Plaintiff: Sally Richardson
Defendant: Michael's Catering, Michael Richardson, Sherry Moen, Mike and Stuart Little
Case Number: 5:2019cv05039
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER denying without prejudict [] Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 6/24/19. (SB)
June 14, 2019 MOTION to DISMISS #1 Complaint in relationship with #14 by Michael's Catering, Michael Richardson. (KLE)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to Dismiss and ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Michael's Catering, Michael Richardson. (Pechota, Terry)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Seal Existing Document. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 6/13/19. (SB)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Seal Existing Document #2 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Summons Issued by Sally Richardson. (Collins, Jeffery)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Sherry Moen served on 5/22/2019. (Stalley, Cassidy)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Katy L. Bonesio; granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Katherine Armstrong Nelson; granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nathaniel Hiller Nesbitt; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Katy Lynn Rankin. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 5/28/19. (SB)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Michael's Catering served on 5/16/2019. (Stalley, Cassidy)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Michael Richardson served on 5/16/2019. (Stalley, Cassidy)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Summmons(es), AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery on 05/10/19. (KLE) Modified on 6/13/2019 sealed per Order of the Court(KLE).
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Katy Lynn Rankin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3057073) by Sally Richardson. (Stalley, Cassidy)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney Nathaniel Hiller Nesbitt to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3057071) by Sally Richardson. (Stalley, Cassidy)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Katherine Armstrong Nelson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3057066) by Sally Richardson. (Stalley, Cassidy)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney Katy L. Bonesio to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3057053) by Sally Richardson. (Stalley, Cassidy)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Sally Richardson. (Stalley, Cassidy) Modified on 6/13/2019 Sealed per Order of the Court (KLE).
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3055950) filed by Sally Richardson in shell case on 05/09/19. (DLC) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/10/2019) (DLC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Richardson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael's Catering
Represented By: Terry L. Pechota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Richardson
Represented By: Terry L. Pechota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Moen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike
Represented By: Terry L. Pechota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Richardson
Represented By: Cassidy M. Stalley
Represented By: Jeffery D. Collins
Represented By: Katherine Armstrong Nelson
Represented By: Nathaniel Hiller Nesbitt
Represented By: Katy Lynn Rankin
Represented By: Katy L. Bonesio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?