American Zurich Insurance Company et al v. Kumho Tire Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: American Zurich Insurance Company and Heavy Constructors Inc.
Defendant: Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc., Kumho Tire Co., Inc. and Kumho Tire (Vietnam) CO., LTD.
Case Number: 5:2019cv05044
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 NO FURTHER DOCKETING IN THIS CASE. ALL FURTHER DOCKETING TO BE DONE IN LEAD CASE 18-5036. (DJP)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 7/30/19. (SB)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Kumho Tire Co., Inc. 1 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(CLR)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Kumho Tire (Vietnam) CO., LTD.. 1 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to law office staff. (Attachments: #1 AO 85, #2 Summons)(TAL)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand filed by American Zurich Insurance Company, Heavy Constructors Inc.. (Ashmore, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sei Joon (Steve) Park. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 7/15/19. (SB)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of C. Scott Toomey. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 7/15/19. (SB)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc.. (King, Rory)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney Sei Joon (Steve) Park to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3106418) by Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc.. (King, Rory)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney C. Scott Toomey to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3106405) by Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc.. (King, Rory)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rory King on behalf of Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc.. (King, Rory)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan L. Woody. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 7/8/19. (SB)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons in a Civil Action, filed by American Zurich Insurance Company, Heavy Constructors Inc.. (Ashmore, Daniel)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney Ryan L. Woody to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3087320) by American Zurich Insurance Company, Heavy Constructors Inc.. (Ashmore, Daniel)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kumho Tire Co., Inc., Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc.. Summmons(es), AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Kumho Tire Co., Inc., #2 Summons Kumho Tire U.S.A., #3 AO 85 form)(JLS)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3086068) filed by American Zurich Insurance Company, Heavy Constructors Inc. in shell case on 6/17/19. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Zurich Insurance Company et al v. Kumho Tire Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Zurich Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel E. Ashmore
Represented By: Ryan L. Woody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heavy Constructors Inc.
Represented By: Daniel E. Ashmore
Represented By: Ryan L. Woody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kumho Tire U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Rory King
Represented By: Sei (Steve) J. Park
Represented By: C. Scott Toomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kumho Tire Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kumho Tire (Vietnam) CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?