Christensen et al v. Dunn et al

Plaintiff: William J. Bom, Marianne Karl-Christensen and Paula Michelle Christensen
Defendant: NWE Management Company, Kelly Dunn and Meadowlark Hill Mobile Park Estates
Case Number: 5:2019cv05046
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Housing/ Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER Received from Paula M. Christensen to DRSD. (SRA)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER Received from Paula M. Christensen containing Certified Letter Receipts. (SRA)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER Received from Paula M. Christensen to Peg Perreault, Evironmental Protection Agency Project Officer for Region 8. (SRA)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Terry G. Westergaard on behalf of All Defendants. (Westergaard, Terry)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to DISMISS filed by All Defendants. (Pickar, Eric)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS by Kelly Dunn, Meadowlark Hill Mobile Park Estates, NWE Management Company. (Pickar, Eric)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER Received from Paula M. Christensen to State Court Judge. (SKK)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Kelly Dunn, Meadowlark Hill Mobile Park Estates, NWE Management Company served on 7/3/19. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Paula M. Christensen, #2 2nd Letter from Paula M. Christensen)(SKK)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Complaint together with the filing fee and completed summons(es). A new case has been opened. Your summmonses were issued. You are responsible for arranging service of the summons(es) and complaint on the defendant(s). If you are interested in receiving electronic notice of documents filed in your case and/or electronically filing documents in your case, complete and return the enclosed CM/ECF Pro Se Litigation Application Form. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. (JLS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. 3 Summmonses, a Rule 73 Memo, a copy of Fed.R.Civ.P.4, and 4 AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery. (Fed.R.Civ.P.4 being mailed to each Plaintiff with AO85) (JLS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Paula Michelle Christensen. (JLS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, ($400 fee paid, receipt# SDX500005910) filed by Paula Michelle Christensen, William J. Bom, Marianne Karl-Christensen. (Attachments: #1 Attachments to Complaint) (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christensen et al v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NWE Management Company
Represented By: Eric J. Pickar
Represented By: Terry G. Westergaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Dunn
Represented By: Eric J. Pickar
Represented By: Terry G. Westergaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meadowlark Hill Mobile Park Estates
Represented By: Eric J. Pickar
Represented By: Terry G. Westergaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Bom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne Karl-Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Michelle Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?