Wiseley v. Stevens
Plaintiff: Michael Wiseley
Defendant: Matthew T. Stevens
Case Number: 5:2019cv05047
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay by Michael Wiseley. (JLS)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael Wiseley. (DJP)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983). (SRA)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (TAL)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Civil Rights Complaint together with an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury. Although a new case has been opened, your application to proceed without prepayment of fees may be denied unless you return the enclosed Prisoner Trust Account Report (to be completed by the institution where you are incarcerated.) Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. (CLR)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Wiseley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Inmate Bank Transaction List) (CLR)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights filed by Michael Wiseley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Supreme Court Documents, #2 Attachment 2 - Jail Phone Records) (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiseley v. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew T. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wiseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?