Stover et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Delbert L. Stover and Shirley J. Stover
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 5:2019cv05051
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Health Care/ Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Delbert L. Stover, Shirley J. Stover. (Goodsell, G.)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ultrapro Instructions for Use, #2 Exhibit 2 - Pretrial Order No. 15, filed in MDL No. 2327, #3 Exhibit 3 - Pretrial Order No. 117, filed in MDL No. 2327, #4 Exhibit 4 - Pretrial Order No. 118, filed in MDL No. 2327, #5 Exhibit 5 - Minute Order Suspending Rule 7.19(a), filed in MDL No. 2327, #6 Exhibit 6 - Pretrial Order No. 304, filed in MDL No. 2327) (Hurd, Jeffrey)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Hurd, Jeffrey). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 8/16/2019 (DLC).
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, and Ex. 1 - Master Complaint served on Johnson & Johnson on 07/25/2019, filed by Shirley J. Stover. (Goodsell, G.)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, and Ex. 1 - Master Complaint served on Ethicon, Inc. on 07/25/2019, filed by Shirley J. Stover. (Goodsell, G.)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc. 1 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85 for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Ethicon, Inc., #2 AO 85)(DLC)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Shirley J. Stover. (Goodsell, G.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson. 1 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Rule 73 Memo, #2 AO-85)(SRA)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3109435) filed by Shirley J. Stover, Delbert L. Stover in shell case on 7/17/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Long Form Complaint from WV) (SRA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stover et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Emily M. Swanson
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Emily M. Swanson
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delbert L. Stover
Represented By: G. Verne Goodsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley J. Stover
Represented By: G. Verne Goodsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?