Soto v. United States Marshalls et al
Plaintiff: Kyle G. Soto
Defendant: United States Marshalls, Judge Robert Mandel and Pennington County Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 5:2019cv05053
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 RECEIPT of Initial Partial Filing Fee from Kyle G. Soto. Amount Paid: $13.33. Receipt No.: SDX300003258. (DLC)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $13.33 is due by 9/19/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 8/5/19. (SB)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Civil Rights Complaint together with an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury and Prisoner Trust Account Report. A new case has been opened. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. (SLW)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (SLW)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kyle G. Soto. (SLW)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights with Jury Demand filed by Kyle Soto. (SLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soto v. United States Marshalls et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Marshalls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Robert Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennington County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle G. Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?