Bowen v. Bituminous Paving, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ernest W. Bowen
Defendant: Bituminous Paving, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv05054
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Katelyn A. Cook on behalf of Bituminous Paving, Inc.. (Cook, Katelyn)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 8/27/19. (SB)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael D. Newman. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 8/26/19. (SB)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bituminous Paving, Inc.. (Ashmore, Daniel)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Michael D. Newman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3136923) by Ernest W. Bowen. (Goodsell, G.)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service of Summons, Complaint served on Bituminous Paving, Inc. on 8/6/19, filed by Ernest W. Bowen. (Goodsell, G.) Modified on 8/12/2019 (DJP).
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 Rejection of Service of Summons, Complaint filed by Ernest W. Bowen. (Goodsell, G.) Modified on 8/12/2019 (DJP).
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service of Summons, Complaint, and Ex. 1 - Master Complaint served on Bituminous Paving, Inc. on 07/25/2019, filed by Ernest W. Bowen. (Goodsell, G.) Modified on 8/12/2019 (DJP).
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bituminous Paving, Inc. 1 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(KLE)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-311) filed by Ernest W. Bowen in shell case on 07/24/2019. (KLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowen v. Bituminous Paving, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bituminous Paving, Inc.
Represented By: Katelyn A. Cook
Represented By: Daniel E. Ashmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest W. Bowen
Represented By: G. Verne Goodsell
Represented By: Michael D. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?