Lucero v. Pennington County Sherrifs Office Jail Division et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Lucero, Jr.
Defendant: Capt. Brook Haga, Capt. Wade Anderson, Lt. Tisay Munsch, Pennington County Sherrifs Office Jail Division, Lt. Kathleen Houston and Robert Yantis
Case Number: 5:2019cv05056
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 21 LETTER Received from Plaintiff to the Clerk's Office. (TAL) (Main Document 21 replaced on 9/27/2019) (TAL). (mailed copy of docket sheet to Plaintiff) Modified on 9/27/2019 to add text (TAL).
September 6, 2019 Filing 20 LETTER Received from Plaintiff to Clerk's Office. (TAL)
August 29, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas Lucero, Jr (DJP)
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas Lucero, Jr (JLS)
August 14, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Eric LaDeaux. (JLS)
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Seth Hernandez. (JLS)
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Andrew Smith. (JLS)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 2nd DECLARATION of Thomas Lucero, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - medical records, #2 cover letter) (JLS)
August 13, 2019 RECEIPT of Initial Partial Filing Fee from Thomas Lucero, Jr. Amount Paid: $2.23. Receipt No.: SDX500005967. (KLE)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER Received from Thomas Lucero to Clerk of the Court. (Attachments: #1 19-5056. Inner Evelopes each containing copies of Doc. #1 , #2 , #3 , #9 , and #11 ) (SLT)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 Third MOTION for Leave to File an Amended #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) by Thomas Lucero, Jr. (SRA)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 Amended CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SRA)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Leave to file an Amended #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) by Thomas Lucero, Jr. (SRA)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $2.23 is due by 9/3/2019. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/1/19. Mailed to Plaintiff and Financial Department at Pennington County Jail (SRA)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Civil Rights Complaint together with an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury and Prisoner Trust Account Report. A new case has been opened. Copy of docket sheet sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. (SRA)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (SRA)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas Lucero, Jr. (SRA)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Thomas Lucero, Jr. (SRA)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Thomas Lucero. (SRA)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to File an Amended #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) by Thomas Lucero, Jr. (SRA)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights with Jury Demand filed by Thomas Lucero, Jr. (SRA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2019: #1 Administrative Claim) (SRA). (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/31/2019) (SRA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucero v. Pennington County Sherrifs Office Jail Division et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Brook Haga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Wade Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Tisay Munsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennington County Sherrifs Office Jail Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Kathleen Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Yantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Lucero, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?