Leeson et al v. City of Deadwood
Plaintiff: Paula Leeson and Gerald Leeson
Defendant: City of Deadwood
Case Number: 5:2019cv05061
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 10/2/19. (SB)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Deadwood. (Christianson, Christopher)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued Acknowledgement filed by Gerald Leeson, Paula Leeson. (Westergaard, Terry)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Deadwood. 1 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(CLR)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3139367) filed by Gerald Leeson, Paula Leeson in shell case on 8/23/2019. (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leeson et al v. City of Deadwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Leeson
Represented By: Terry G. Westergaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Leeson
Represented By: Terry G. Westergaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Deadwood
Represented By: Christopher A. Christianson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?