Tornquist v. Young et al
Petitioner: Matthew C. Tornquist
Respondent: Darin Young and Marty Jackley
Case Number: 5:2019cv05065
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
2 Judge: Daneta Wollmann
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to DISMISS Petitioner's Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Renewed filed by Marty Jackley, Darin Young. (Wald, Sherri)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Marty Jackley, Darin Young (Wald, Sherri)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why Matthew Tornquist's 2254 petition should not be dismissed as untimely. Show Cause Response due by 11/25/2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 10/23/2019. (Duffy, Veronica) Modified Document Type to Opinion on 10/24/2019 (DLC).
September 30, 2019 RECEIVED South Dakota State Supreme Court record #27197, Fall River County CR 12-158, Fall River County CIV 17-132. The records are located on the Clerk of Court N Drive. (SLW)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to DISMISS Petitioner's Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Marty Jackley, Darin Young. (Wald, Sherri)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to DISMISS Petitioner's Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Marty Jackley, Darin Young. (Wald, Sherri)
September 17, 2019 US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy added. US Magistrate Judge Daneta Wollmann no longer assigned to case. (JLS)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing service upon respondents. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 9/17/2019. (CG)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PETITIONER: The Clerks Office has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 together with a Motion to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Declaration. Although a new case has been opened, your motion to proceed without prepayment of fees may be denied unless you return the enclosed Prisoner Trust Account Report (to be completed by the institution where you are incarcerated.) Copy of docket sheet and Prisoner Trust Account Report sent to petitioner. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. (SLT)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Matthew C. Tornquist. (Attachments: #1 Incomplete Prisoner Trust Acct. Report) (SLT)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 filed by Matthew C. Tornquist. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tornquist v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darin Young
Represented By: Sherri Sundem Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marty Jackley
Represented By: Sherri Sundem Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Matthew C. Tornquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?