Schat v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Joyce I. Schat
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv05076
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es) delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (SLT)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Joyce I. Schat. (Zephier, Robin)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es) delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (SLT)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Joyce I. Schat. (Zephier, Robin)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by SaraBeth Donovan on behalf of United States of America. (Donovan, SaraBeth)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Plaintiff Joyce I. Schat on Attorney General (Zephier, Robin)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued as to USA Acknowledgement filed by Joyce I. Schat. (Zephier, Robin)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es), AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 AO85)(MSB)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3197436) filed by Joyce I. Schat in shell case on 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Federal Tort Claim,, #2 Exhibit Denial Letter, #3 Exhibit Administrative Notice of Claim) (MSB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schat v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce I. Schat
Represented By: Robin L. Zephier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: SaraBeth Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?