Crow v. Travelers Indemnity Company et al
Plaintiff: Rex Crow
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company and Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv05015
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Anderson Lewis on behalf of All Defendants. (Lewis, Barbara)
April 13, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim Affidavit of Wendy C. Skjerven filed by Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Workers Compensation and Employers Liability Policy) (Collins, Jeffery)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Workers Compensation Coverage Verification, #2 Exhibit B - Petition for Hearing) (Collins, Jeffery)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Travelers Indemnity Company. (Collins, Jeffery)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by Travelers Indemnity Company. (Collins, Jeffery)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Settlement Agreement and Release) (Collins, Jeffery)
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp for Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Collins, Jeffery)
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Travelers Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp for Travelers Indemnity Company. (Collins, Jeffery)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Larry Deiter Acknowledgement filed by Rex Crow. (Beardsley, Michael)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company. 1 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85)(SLT)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3268643) filed by Rex Crow in shell case on 2/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Denial letter from Travelers) (SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crow v. Travelers Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Barbara Anderson Lewis
Represented By: Jeffery D. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Barbara Anderson Lewis
Represented By: Jeffery D. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex Crow
Represented By: Steven C. Beardsley
Represented By: Michael S. Beardsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?