Two Eagle v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Lonnie Two Eagle, Sr.
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2020cv05054
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United States of America. (Hofmann (USA), Michaele)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Diana Ryan Acknowledgement filed by Lonnie Two Eagle, Sr. (LaFleur, Jon)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michaele S. Hofmann (USA) on behalf of United States of America. (Hofmann (USA), Michaele)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 REDACTED DOCUMENT Complaint by Lonnie Two Eagle, Sr. Redacted version of previously filed document #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Federal Tort Claim) (LaFleur, Jon)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es), AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(KLE)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, $400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3382763, in shell case on 08/31/2020 filed by Lonnie Two Eagle, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Exhbit 1: Federal Tort Claim) (KLE) Modified on 9/1/2020 to restrict access to attachment via JLV chambers (KLE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Two Eagle v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Two Eagle, Sr.
Represented By: Jon J. LaFleur
Represented By: Robin L. Zephier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Michaele S. Hofmann (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?