Rosebud Sioux Tribe et al v. Barnett et al
Plaintiff: Rosebud Sioux Tribe, Four Directions, Inc. and Oglala Sioux Tribe
Defendant: Craig Price, Laurie Gill, Steve Barnett and Marcia Hultman
Case Number: 5:2020cv05058
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Filing 24 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Steve Barnett served on Governor Kristi Noem. (Pechota, Terry)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/02/2020. (MSB)
October 30, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Steve Barnett, Laurie Gill, Marcia Hultman, Craig Price. (Flynn, Grant) Modified event to motion on 10/30/2020 (SLW).
October 26, 2020 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Jason Ravnsborg, Kristi Noem. 2 Summons(es) delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (SLW)
October 26, 2020 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Four Directions, Inc., Oglala Sioux Tribe, Rosebud Sioux Tribe. (Pechota, Terry)
October 21, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Steve Barnett, Laurie Gill, Marcia Hultman, Craig Price. (Flynn, Grant)
October 21, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Steve Barnett, Laurie Gill, Marcia Hultman, Craig Price. (Flynn, Grant)
October 21, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant M. Flynn on behalf of Steve Barnett, Laurie Gill, Marcia Hultman, Craig Price. (Flynn, Grant)
October 20, 2020 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Marcia Hultman on Marcia Hultman (Pechota, Terry)
October 20, 2020 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Laurie Gill on Laurie Gill (Pechota, Terry)
October 20, 2020 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Craig Price on Craig Price (Pechota, Terry)
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Steve Barnett on Steve Barnett (Pechota, Terry)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Natalie Landreth. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/14/2020. (MSB)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney Natalie Landreth to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3410749) by Four Directions, Inc., Oglala Sioux Tribe, Rosebud Sioux Tribe. (Pechota, Terry)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kim J. Gottschalk for Four Directions, Inc., Oglala Sioux Tribe and Rosebud Sioux Tribe. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/08/2020. (MSB)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jacqueline D. DeLeon for Four Directions, Inc., Oglala Sioux Tribe and Rosebud Sioux Tribe. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/07/2020. (MSB)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Miranda Galindo for Four Directions, Inc. ,Oglala Sioux Tribe and Rosebud Sioux Tribe. . Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/07/2020. (MSB) Modified docket text on 10/7/2020 (MSB).
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brenda Wright for Four Directions, Inc. ,Oglala Sioux Tribe and Rosebud Sioux Tribe. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/07/2020. (MSB) Modified docket text on 10/7/2020 (MSB).
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Kim Gottschalk to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3406260) by Four Directions, Inc., Oglala Sioux Tribe, Rosebud Sioux Tribe. (Pechota, Terry)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney Jacqueline DeLeon to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3406250) by Four Directions, Inc., Oglala Sioux Tribe, Rosebud Sioux Tribe. (Pechota, Terry)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Miranda Galindo to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3406034) by Four Directions, Inc., Oglala Sioux Tribe, Rosebud Sioux Tribe. (Pechota, Terry)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney Brenda Wright to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3406027) by Four Directions, Inc., Oglala Sioux Tribe, Rosebud Sioux Tribe. (Pechota, Terry)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Steve Barnett, Laurie Gill, Marcia Hultman, Craig Price. 4 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Barnett Summons Issued, #2 Gill Summons Issued, #3 Hultman Summons Issued, #4 Price Summons Issued, #5 AO85)(MSB)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, $400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3393121, in shell case on 09/16/2020 filed by Rosebud Sioux Tribe, Oglala Sioux Tribe, Four Directions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - May 20, 2020 Letter to SOS, #2 Exhibit 2 - Power Point) (MSB) (Main Document 1 replaced to fix page order of Civil Coversheet on 9/17/2020) (MSB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosebud Sioux Tribe et al v. Barnett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Price
Represented By: Grant M. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Gill
Represented By: Grant M. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Barnett
Represented By: Grant M. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Hultman
Represented By: Grant M. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosebud Sioux Tribe
Represented By: Terry L. Pechota
Represented By: Natalie Landreth
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Represented By: Jacqueline D. DeLeon
Represented By: Brenda Wright
Represented By: Miranda Galindo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Four Directions, Inc.
Represented By: Terry L. Pechota
Represented By: Natalie Landreth
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Represented By: Jacqueline D. DeLeon
Represented By: Brenda Wright
Represented By: Miranda Galindo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oglala Sioux Tribe
Represented By: Terry L. Pechota
Represented By: Natalie Landreth
Represented By: Kim J. Gottschalk
Represented By: Jacqueline D. DeLeon
Represented By: Brenda Wright
Represented By: Miranda Galindo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?