Benson v. Kunz
Plaintiff: Shelly Benson
Defendant: Matthew Kunz
Case Number: 5:2020cv05064
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Referring Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Stipulation for Joinder of cases. All future filing shall be in the designated lead case 5:19-cv-5062-KES. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on December 2, 2020. (DLC)
December 2, 2020 NO FURTHER DOCKETING IN THIS CASE; ALL FURTHER DOCKETING TO BE DONE IN LEAD CASE 5:19-cv-5062-KES (DLC)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Joinder by Matthew Kunz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williams, Richard)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 (FILED IN ERROR) Unopposed MOTION for Joinder by Matthew Kunz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williams, Richard) Modified on 11/2/2020 (DJP).
November 2, 2020 NOTICE of Filing Error: #5 Motion for Joinder was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Williams, Richard)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier for all further proceedings. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/29/2020. (KLE)
October 22, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Matthew Kunz. (SLT)
October 22, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 73 MEMO. (Attachments: #1 AO85)(SLT)
October 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Matthew Kunz ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3416446) (Attachments: #1 State Court Records, #2 (FILED IN ERROR) Answer)(SLT) Modified on 10/22/2020 attachment 2 re-filed re #3 (SLT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benson v. Kunz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly Benson
Represented By: Michael P. Shubeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Kunz
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mann
Represented By: Richard M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?